# Maths – Thursday 14th January

First of all, check your work from yesterday and make sure that you are happy with multiplying two 2-digit numbers.

We will then look at multiplying a 3-digit by a 2-digit number using the written method shown.

Watch the examples given on the slides below and then practise using the worksheet.

Some of you will be able to work through the whole session in one go but some of you may do half today (up to and including question 4) and then do the rest tomorrow.

There is an extra question to investigate below too should you need it.

You should spend between 1 hour and 1 hour 15 minutes on this.

LESSON SLIDES

WORKSHEET

CHALLENGE

### 40 thoughts on “Maths – Thursday 14th January”

• 14th January 2021 at 9:15 am

I think the answer to 25×111=2774.
I notice that the 100s and 10s are counting up from 4.
No it sometimes works.
Basicly all the columns count up or down.
Most of the numbers are even accept from 111 and 553

• 14th January 2021 at 11:57 am

When does the pattern stop?

• 14th January 2021 at 1:09 pm

Maths worksheet
1a
=39
=390
b
=260
=2600
c
=100
=1000
d
=816
=8160

2
=12,288

3
4968

4
=4402
=11342
=15502
=4392

• 14th January 2021 at 1:44 pm

Well done Mia.

• 14th January 2021 at 9:43 am

I think 25×111=2775.
I notice that most numbers are the same especially 2.
No it only works sometimes because it is most likely different numbers.
Basicly the number are in 2s from 24 and 4 to 26 to 6.
They are Basicly all even number accept from 553 and 111.

• 14th January 2021 at 11:56 am

What do you notice about the middle two numbers?

What happens to the ones digit?

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 9:47 am

There are only 4 Maths questions on the worksheet, is that correct?

• 14th January 2021 at 10:36 am

There is a second side showing questions 5 to 8.

• 14th January 2021 at 9:54 am

Maths challenge
25×111=2775
I notice the two numbers in the middle In the answer are the same and the one s digit in 22,23,24,25 the numbers in the middle are 2 times higher. I don’t know if it always work’s?

• 14th January 2021 at 11:55 am

This is a good thing to notice Michael – well done!

See if you can investigate further. Maybe write down the pattern of numbers and see what you notice.

2553
2664
2775
2886
2997
3108

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 10:02 am

maths:
1. a. 39 390
b. 260 2600
c. 100 1000
d. 816 8080
2. a) 293 2310
b) 512×4 512×20
3. Brett didn’t add the extra 10 and the answer is 6922
4. a) 4260 b) 15502 c) 11342 d) 4392
5. a. 310×20=6200 b. I chose this one because its the closest to each number c. Filip d. 5852 e. I don’t actually know
I got up to to here

• 14th January 2021 at 11:52 am

Well done Kiran.

Try 4a again (142 x 31).

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 10:02 am

Worksheet
1) a
13
3
——
39
——
B.
130
2
———
2 6 0
———
C.25
4
——
001
——
2 2

• 14th January 2021 at 10:03 am

I don’t get question 2

• 14th January 2021 at 11:50 am

Hello Rihanna

For 2a, the question is 231 x 13. It has been broken down into 231 x 3 and 231 x 10. 231 x 3 is 693 and 231 x 10 is 2310. To find the overall product you would then add the two parts together (693 + 2310). Have a try!

• 14th January 2021 at 10:15 am

12×4=48
12×40=480
206×3=618
206×300=61,800
132×23=3036
326×32=10,432
248×21=5,208

• 14th January 2021 at 11:51 am

Well done. Now try the worksheet.

• 14th January 2021 at 10:18 am

Mr Simmons did not give me my book so I had to do it on lined paper

• 14th January 2021 at 10:53 am

That’s fine Bella! Maths works on lined paper too!

Hope you’re ok.

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 10:28 am

Maths worksheet
~1~
A
13×3=39
13×30=390

B
130×2=260
130×20=2600

C
25×4=100
25×40=1000

D
204×4=816
204×40=8160

~2~
Stuck.

~3~
Stuck again

~4~
A
142×31=4402

B
Stuck

C
214×53=11342

D
24×183=4392

• 14th January 2021 at 10:52 am

The questions you have answered are absolutely fine Saheera.

The idea is to multiply the 3-digit number firstly by the ones of the 2-digit and then by the tens.

So for 231 x 13 you would do 231 x 3 and then 231 x 10.

For 512 x 24 you would do 512 x 4 and then 512 x 20.

Have a go at these two and see how you get on.

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 10:29 am

Maths worksheet
1a
13×3=39
13×30=390
b
130×2=260
130×20=2600
c
25×4=100
25×40=1000
d
204×4=816
204×40=8100

2
512×24=12,288

3
4968

4
142×3=4402
214×53=11342
337×45=15502
24×193=4392

• 14th January 2021 at 10:49 am

Well done Malaki. Check 204 x 40.

• 14th January 2021 at 10:35 am

1) a) 39 390 b) 260 2600 c) 100 1000 d) 816 8160
2) (512×4) (512×20)
3) Insted of x by 20 he x by 2 4968
4) 4402 15502 11984 4392
5) 5700 I chose that because it is closest Filip 5852
6) 6656 m2 3,756009615384615
7) > >
8) 11152 pence

• 14th January 2021 at 11:42 am

A superb effort Franek!

I do have a couple of questions:

Question 6 – It asks how many football pitches could fit inside the field. Is it possible to have 3.7560096 football pitches? What would the answer have to be?

Question 8 – Can you write 11152 pence in pounds and pence?

Then try the challenge question. Investigate it in detail!

Great work!

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 12:45 pm

4?
111.52 pounds

• 14th January 2021 at 1:44 pm

Hello Franek

Would you be able to fit 4 whole pitches into that space?

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 11:40 am

i did half of the work sorry i didnt finish also some was quite easy so i did something

• 14th January 2021 at 1:52 pm

Ok.

Feel free to try the second half.

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 11:45 am

Maths
1. 13×3=39
13×30=390

130×2=260
13×20=2600

25×4=100
25×40=1000

204×4=816
204×40=8160

2. 231×13=3003
512×24=12’288

3. Brett’s mistake was putting the 18 in the wrong place. 4968

4. 142×31= 4402
214×53=11’432
337×46=15’502
24×183=4338

5. 300×20=6000-148- it is less and close is the answer.
300×19=5700-152

Whitney thought less than 10x and Nijah thought up to 100x.

6. 6656
3

7. >
>
It is the same symbol.

8. 697
£111.52

25×111=2775
I notice that 111 times a number has a difference on its ones in the thousands.

• 14th January 2021 at 1:52 pm

Hello Hargun

Well done! You show a really good understanding.

Check 4d (24 x 183).

For the challenge, try to investigate it a little more. Each time you add 111, what do you notice about each digit? List the numbers you make and see what is the same and different.

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 3:03 pm

Hi thanks for reminding me and the answer was 4392

Many thanks.

• 14th January 2021 at 11:49 am

Maths
1.13 x 3 = 39
13 x 30 = 390
130 x 2 = 260
130 x 20 = 2600
25 x 4 = 100
25 x 40 = 1000
204 x 4 = 816
204 x 4 = 8160

2. 231 x 31 = 2643
512 x 24 = 3288

3. Brett carried 6 x 3 = 18 and he was not lyning the numbers up correctly.

4. 142 x 31 = 4402
214 x 53 = 20742
337 x 46 = 16102
24 x 183 = 4392

• 14th January 2021 at 1:48 pm

Hello Talal

Question 1 and 4a and 4d are fine. Double check the others.

Don’t forget that you multiply the 3-digit number by the ones digit of the 2-digit number, and then by the tens digit.

You can then add the 2 parts together.

Mr Bushell

• 14th January 2021 at 12:07 pm

25×111=2775

112×63 is bigger than 181×2

380×24=9120

• 14th January 2021 at 1:20 pm

Worksheet
1.
A. 13×3=39
13×30=390
B. 130×2=260
130×20=2600
C. 25×4=100
25×40=1000
D. 204×4=816
204×40=8160

2.
231×13=3003
512×24=12288
(512×4) ( 512×20)

3.
216×23=4968
Brett made a mistake by putting his calculations in the wrong columns

4.
A. 142×31=4402
B. 337×46=15302
C. 214×53=11342
24×183=6392

Challenge
I notice that the numbers are increasing by 111.
Yes.

• 14th January 2021 at 1:43 pm

Hello Alex

Overall, you have done well here. Check 4b and 4d.

Feel free to carry on with questions 5 onwards.

For the challenge, look carefully at the patterns formed by adding 11 each time. How do the digits change?

Mr Bushell